Attia, Amine Naguib (CPSO#: 79994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
108 - 3050 Confederation Pkwy
Mississauga ON  L5B 3Z6
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

F001B - 6045 Creditview Rd
Mississauga ON  L5V 2A8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Confederation Medical Centre
3050 Confederation Parkway
Suite 108
Mississauga ON  L5B 3Z6
Canada
Phone: (905) 306-7885
Fax: (905) 306-7895
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. N. Attia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Attia ( CPSO# 79994 )

Business Address:
F001B
6045 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2A8
Phone Number: (905) 826-6095

Business Address:
Confederation Medical Centre
Suite 108
3050 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5B 3Z6
Phone Number: (905) 306-7885

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMINE NAGUIB ATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2016

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Jul 2009
Summary:

 On July 16, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Attia committed an act of professional 
 misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 unprofessional.

Dr. Attia obtained his medical degree in Egypt in 1979. Between 1980 and 1995, 
 Dr. Attia practiced medicine in Egypt and Saudi Arabia. He immigrated to Canada in 1995. Between 
 2001 and 2003, Dr. Attia practiced medicine in Newfoundland. He submitted an application to the 
 CPSO in 2003. On the application, he inaccurately stated that he practised as a general 
 practitioner in Egypt from 1980 to 2001. In fact, he did not practice medicine continuously in any 
 jurisdiction between 1995 and 2001. Dr. Attia maintains that he returned to Cairo for periods in 
 1996, 1998 and 2001, at which time he states that he attended patients. Dr. Attia failed to 
 account for this break in his practice history on his application, and also failed to disclose his 
 period of practice in Saudi Arabia.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.  Dr. 
 Attia successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent 
 Course on the next available date, and in any event within six months of the date of the Order, 
 and to provide proof thereof to the College.

2.  Dr. Attia appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.

3.  Dr. Attia pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the 
 date of the Order.

4.  The results of this proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 16, 2009

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)