Attia, Menat (CPSO#: 97579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Summerville Family Health Team
101 Queensway West, fifth floor
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9700
Fax: (905) 272-1416
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Menat Attia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Attia ( CPSO# 97579 )

Business Address:
5th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MENAT ATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014