Auer, Rebecca Ann Craufurd (CPSO#: 74952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: Taylor, Rebecca Ann Craufurd (used until: 10 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Division of General Surgery
CCW 1617, Box 134
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 72791
Fax: (613) 737-8659
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca C. Auer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Auer ( CPSO# 74952 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Division of General Surgery
CCW 1617
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANN CRAUFURD AUER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 28 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007