Auger, Dominique (CPSO#: 66733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Unit#F1
Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone: (416)598-1703
Fax: (416)598-1778
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI the Doctor's office
345 Bloor Street east
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Canada
Phone: 416-515-0590
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MCI Doctor's office
Royal Bank Plaza
200 Bay street Unit LR8
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Canada
Phone: 416-368-6787
Fax: 416-368-7632
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1 Yorkdale Road, suite 320
Toronto,ON,M6A 3A1
Toronto ON  M6A3A1
Canada
Phone: 416-440-4040 Ext. 133
Fax: 416-785-5561
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MCI Atrium Bay
595 Bay street
Toronto
M5G 2C2
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Canada
Phone: 416-598-1703
Fax: 416-598-1778
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St-Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-360-4000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Auger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Auger ( CPSO# 66733 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5M 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 598-1703

Business Address:
200 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 368-6787

Business Address:
345 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Phone Number: (416) 515-0590

Business Address:
245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 488-1455

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE AUGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997