Auguste, Bourne Lewis Adrian (CPSO#: 97551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4C3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-827
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bourne Auguste Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Auguste ( CPSO# 97551 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
Markham-Stoufvillr Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOURNE LEWIS ADRIAN AUGUSTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGUSTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016