Aulakh, Amandev Kaur (CPSO#: 95555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pivot Sport Medicine & Orthopaedics
2288 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1N9
Phone: (416) 767-4868
Fax: (416) 763-2577
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

190 Sherway Drive
Suite 112
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 626-1066
Fax: (416) 626-4775
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDEV KAUR AULAKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AULAKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2014