Awad, Lucy (CPSO#: 82174)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodview Medical Centre
3236 Weston Road
North York ON  M9M 2T8
Phone: (416) 745-0600
Fax: (416) 745-0607
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lucy Awad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Awad ( CPSO# 82174 )

Business Address:
Woodview Medical Centre
3236 Weston Road
North York ON  M9M 2T8
Phone Number: (647) 774-8286

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., October 5, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term,
            condition and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by
            Dr. Lucy Awad:

                  At her own expense, Dr. Awad shall successfully complete College-
                  facilitated instruction in Ethics no later than one (1) year from the
                  date of this Order.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Oct 2012
Summary:

On October 5, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lucy Awad committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Awad admitted the allegation. 
 
Dr. Awad is a family physician. She was born in Egypt and received her medical degree in Egypt 
in December 1992. Dr. Awad came to Canada in April 1996. With two exceptions, between 
April 1996 and October 2003, Dr. Awad did not practice medicine. The exceptions were that she: 
  
 
(a)   worked on a part time basis between December 1996 and May 1997 at the American 
      Hospital in Tanta, Egypt; and 
(b)   completed two months of training in the Psychiatric Department of the Ain Shams 
      University Hospital between December 2002 and February 2003. 
 
Dr. Awad applied for registration/ membership to the following licensing/professional bodies: 
      Newfoundland Medical Board in July 2003.  
      College of Family Physicians of Canada in October 2003.  
      College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in December 2004  
      College of Physicians and Surgeons of Manitoba in January 2006.  
 
Dr. Awad provided inaccurate information to these licensing/professional bodies regarding her 
practice history. On the basis of the above four applications, which included inaccurate 
information, Dr. Awad obtained her respective certificates of registration/ memberships. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Awad's 
      certificate of registration: 
      (i)   At her own expense, Dr. Awad shall successfully complete College-facilitated 
            instruction in Ethics no later than one (1) year from the date of this Order. 
 
      Dr. Awad appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
      Dr. Awad pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from 
      the date of this Order. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 5, 2012