Azizi, Behrooz (CPSO#: 95485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-715 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener ON  N2E4E9
Phone: 5197453690
Fax: 5197454856
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Behrooz Azizi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Azizi ( CPSO# 95485 )

Business Address:
715 Fischer-Hallman Road
Suite 201
Kitchener ON  N2E 4E9
Phone Number: (519) 745-3690

Business Address:
310 Main Street East
Suite 201
Milton ON  L9T 1P5
Phone Number: (905) 693-1880

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEHROOZ AZIZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016