Azzopardi, Peter John (CPSO#: 55757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 407
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-5292
Fax: (416) 431-4011
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Azzopardi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Azzopardi ( CPSO# 55757 )

Business Address:
Suite 407
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-5292

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOHN AZZOPARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZOPARDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1987