Babwah, Jesse Paul (CPSO#: 86123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4600
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Gamma-Dynacare Medical Laboratories
115 Midair Ct
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-3000 Ext. 5259
Fax: (888) 527-4919
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jesse Paul Babwah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Babwah ( CPSO# 86123 )

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3000

Business Address:
Room E4-32
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSE PAUL BABWAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABWAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013