Bacher, Jeffrey Charles (CPSO#: 95078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
230 Browns Line
Etobicoke ON  M8W 3T4
Phone: (416) 620-6861
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Canada
Phone: (416) 201-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher ( CPSO# 93621 )
Dr. L. Bacher ( CPSO# 33345 )
Dr. J. Bacher ( CPSO# 95078 )
Dr. C. Bacher ( CPSO# 106716)

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Business Address:
Wexford Nursing Home
1860 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 5B1
Phone Number: (416) 752-8877


Corporation Name: Jeffrey Bacher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bacher ( CPSO# 95078 )

Business Address:
230 Browns Line
Etobicoke ON  M8W 3T4
Phone Number: (416) 620-6861

Business Address:
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY CHARLES BACHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013