Bahrami-Esferjani, Azar (CPSO#: 79727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-7200
Fax: (905) 272-4500
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boll & Bahrami-Esferjani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bahrami-Esferjani ( CPSO# 79727 )
Dr. P. Boll ( CPSO# 77703 )

Business Address:
101 Queensway West
Suite 308 & 620
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-5700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZAR BAHRAMI-ESFERJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHRAMI-ESFERJANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2008