Baig, Mirza Muhammad Waqas (CPSO#: 91318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 bronte street south
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St joseph hospital
50 charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mirza Muhammad Waqas Baig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Baig ( CPSO# 91318 )

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 1K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
St Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRZA MUHAMMAD WAQAS BAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)