Bailey, Kristy Elisa (CPSO#: 95906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 100
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-4415
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristy Bailey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bailey ( CPSO# 95906 )

Business Address:
150 York Street
Suit 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
26 - 3175 Rutherford Road
Concord ON  L4K 5Y6
Phone Number: (905) 761-7765

Business Address:
8333 Weston Road
Suite 100
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-4415

Business Address:
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Suite 8
Toronto ON  M4S 2N5
Phone Number: (647) 351-9277

Business Address:
790 Bay Street
Suite 536
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 515-8808

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTY ELISA BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016