Bains, Rick Amar Bir Singh (CPSO#: 58508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Eye Surgery
1140 Southdale Road West
London ON  N6B 3R8
Phone: (519) 204-8200
Fax: (519) 204-8700
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

28 centennial drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W1
Canada
Phone: (519) 527-8424
Fax: (519) 527-8423
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bains and Dymon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2013


Corporation Name: Rick Bains Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bains ( CPSO# 58508 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
320 Dundas Street
London ON  N6B 3R8
Phone Number: (519) 963-0911

Business Address:
28 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 527-8424

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 11 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICK AMAR BIR SINGH BAINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011