Baker, Jillian Margaret (CPSO#: 75529)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Pediatric Clinic
61 Queen Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Room 9402
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-5859
Fax: (416) 813-5574
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baker Cellarius Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baker ( CPSO# 75529 )
Dr. M. Baker ( CPSO# 24505 )
Dr. V. Cellarius ( CPSO# 75498 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Pediatric Clinic
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3655

Business Address:
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
Mount Sinai Hospital
4th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILLIAN MARGARET BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2000 to 25 Aug 2000
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005