Bal, Manpartap Singh (CPSO#: 96117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310 Ext. 2227
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Bal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bal ( CPSO# 96117 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310


Corporation Name: Khorasani-Zadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bal ( CPSO# 96117 )
Dr. A. Khorasani-Zadeh ( CPSO# 111482)

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
Suite 243
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANPARTAP SINGH BAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016