Balchand, Kamlesh (CPSO#: 82242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction&Mental Health
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 37044
Fax: (416) 583-1341
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Balchand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Balchand ( CPSO# 82242 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMLESH BALCHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALCHAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2005 to 29 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007