Balmain, Sean (CPSO#: 94423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2012

Expiry Date:  14 Oct 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Suite 18-364
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7613
Fax: (416) 586-4775
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Balmain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Balmain ( CPSO# 94423 )

Business Address:
UHN Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Unit 18-364
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 15 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2010 to 17 Nov 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Oct 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sean Balmain may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Division of Cardiology,
                        Department of Medicine, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Balmain
                        holds  an  academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Balmain  no longer  holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Balmain's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Balmain's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on October 15, 2012.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on October 14, 2019.