Baltzer, Heather Lucretia (CPSO#: 90765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
2 East Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5449
Fax: 416-603-5251
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Lucretia Baltzer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Baltzer ( CPSO# 90765 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
422 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5449

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER LUCRETIA BALTZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALTZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015