Banerjee, Avik Upadhyay (CPSO#: 75011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
558 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E3
Phone: (519) 896-0949
Fax: (519) 896-0957
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Avik Banerjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Banerjee ( CPSO# 75011 )

Business Address:
558 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E3
Phone Number: (519) 896-0949

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVIK UPADHYAY BANERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005