Barakat, Sammy Wisam (CPSO#: 73539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Outpatient Mental Health
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905)845-2571 Ext. 4800
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barakat Rajani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Barakat ( CPSO# 73539 )
Dr. P. Rajani ( CPSO# 74687 )

Business Address:
Appleby College Medical
540 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville ON  L6K 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 845-1544

Business Address:
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Outpatient Mental Health
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMMY WISAM BARAKAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARAKAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004