Barker, Kimberley (CPSO#: 70528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 666
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Phone: 8672220055
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Oct 1998 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY BARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 28 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015