Barlas, Joanna (CPSO#: 73460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ryerson Medical Centre
W181 West Kerr Hall
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Canada
Phone: (416) 979-5070
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ryerson Medical Centre
W181 West Kerr Hall
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Canada
Phone: (416) 979-5070
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Apr 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA BARLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 11 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 11 Mar 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2006