Bartlett, Leah Danielle (CPSO#: 83371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302 - 5 quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-3766
Fax: (705) 728-3757
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leah Bartlett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bartlett ( CPSO# 83371 )

Business Address:
Unit 302
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-3766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEAH DANIELLE BARTLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009