Bartucci, Michael (CPSO#: 90790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Red Lake Medical Associates
51G Highway 105
P.O. Box 311
Red Lake ON  P0V 2M0
Phone: (807) 727-2617
Fax: (807) 727-3122
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hassle Free Clinic
66 Gerrard Street East · 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Canada
Phone: (416) 922-0566
Fax: (416) 922-2018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BARTUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTUCCI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011