Barua, Moumita (CPSO#: 80996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Norman Urquhart
8th Floor Room 855
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 8007
Fax: 416-340-4999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Moumita Barua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Barua ( CPSO# 80996 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Norman Urquhart
Room 8N-855
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4073

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOUMITA BARUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARUA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008