Baryla, Yuliya (CPSO#: 92069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Belarusian State Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leaside Health Centre
795 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4G 4E4
Phone: (416) 424-3145
Fax: (416) 424-2611
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuliya Baryla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Baryla ( CPSO# 92069 )

Business Address:
Leaside Health Centre
795 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4G 4E4
Phone Number: (416) 424-3145

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YULIYA BARYLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARYLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2010