Bauman, Nicholaus Leonard Laurence (CPSO#: 79901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Frederick Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5W6
Phone: (705) 481-1419
Fax: 888-680-3170
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholaus Bauman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bauman ( CPSO# 79901 )

Business Address:
41 Frederick Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5W6
Phone Number: (705) 481-1419

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nepal

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAUS LEONARD LAURENCE BAUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008