Bax, Kevin Charles (CPSO#: 90226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Feb 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indiana University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Western Ont
Department of Paediatrics
P O Box 5010 Room B1-164
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8177
Fax: (519) 685-8105
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bax Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bax ( CPSO# 90226 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B1-164
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Feb 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Kevin Charles Bax may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Bax holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when  Dr. Bax no
                  longer holds the apointment, referred to in clause 1.