Bay, Ariel Michael (CPSO#: 81455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: (416) 281-7438
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health
Ajax and Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Ave South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ari Bay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wozniak ( CPSO# 84457 )
Dr. A. Bay ( CPSO# 81455 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIEL MICHAEL BAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2006 to 08 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 May 2006 to 12 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Feb 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2010