Bayliss, Michael Lewis (CPSO#: 81986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1000 Middlegate Rd
Second Floor
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1M4
Phone: 905-804-7000
Fax: 905-804-2250
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Bayliss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bayliss ( CPSO# 81986 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 569-8631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEWIS BAYLISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYLISS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
Elective Trainee - Neurology

McMaster University, 11 Apr 2005 to 30 Apr 2005
Elective Trainee - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 May 2006 to 31 May 2006
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010