Beard, Jonathan Daryl (CPSO#: 92213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Child & Adolescent Mental Health
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4421
Fax: (905) 813-1594
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Roncesvalles Psychology Clinic
120 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 2L1
Canada
Phone: 416-531-5152
Fax: 647-689-2739
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Oct 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 07 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Jonathan Daryl Beard may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry and
            Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, only.