Beauvais, Nicole Lee (CPSO#: 91064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
White Pines Family Health Network
St 208 - 38 Pine St N
Timmins ON  P4N 6K6
Phone: (705) 267-3272
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Beauvais Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Beauvais ( CPSO# 91064 )

Business Address:
White Pines Family Health Network
Suite 208
38 Pine Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6K6
Phone Number: (705) 267-3272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE LEE BEAUVAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUVAIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2011