Bebbington, Fraser Alexander (CPSO#: 96286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill st.
Brantford Ontario
Dept of Anesthesia
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

237 Barton St E
Hamilton, Ontario
Canada
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905 521 2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fraser Bebbington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bebbington ( CPSO# 96286 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
115 Delhi street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRASER ALEXANDER BEBBINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEBBINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016