Beca, Sorin Gheorghe (CPSO#: 91675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
My Endo Diabetes and Endocrinology
Ashgrove Medical Building
6633 Highway 7 East
unit 105
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (416) 840-7744
Fax: (416) 491-5922
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

My Endo Diabetes and Endocrinology
Lebovic community center
9600 Bathurst St
unit 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 840-7744
Fax: (416) 491-5922
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sorin Beca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 20 2013


Corporation Name: Sorin G. Beca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Beca ( CPSO# 91675 )

Business Address:
My Endo Diabetes and Endocrinology
9600 Bathurst Street
Unit 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (416) 840-7744

Business Address:
Cardiomatters Diagnostic Imaging
Unit 105
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 472-7127

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 13 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Sorin  Gheorghe  Beca may practise medicine independently in endocrinology
            and metabolism in an out-patient setting, only.