Bekasiak, Ann Mary (CPSO#: 96911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TMC CLINIC
Suite 101
Tecumseh
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 9795260
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7900 Anchor drive
Windsor ON  N8N5E5
Canada
Phone: 519 979 2002
Fax: 519 979 3838
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6. (416) 398-0638
Date Received: 23 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANN MARY BEKASIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEKASIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2015