Belovay, Graham William (CPSO#: 92743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9135 Keele St
Unit A5
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

145 Kingston Rd
Unit 3
Ajax ON  L1S 7J4
Canada
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

350 Rutherford Rd.,S
Suite 300 Plaz
Brampton ON  L6W 4N6
Canada
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Graham Belovay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Belovay ( CPSO# 92743 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Business Address:
Suite 300
Plaza II
250 Rutherford Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 4N6
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Business Address:
3 - 145 Kingston Road
Ajax ON  L1S 7J4
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Business Address:
A5 - 9135 Keele Street
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAHAM WILLIAM BELOVAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELOVAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015