Belyea, Melita Colleen (CPSO#: 73480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone: (519) 685-3210
Fax: (519) 685-1432
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melita Belyea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Belyea ( CPSO# 73480 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 685-3210

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELITA COLLEEN BELYEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELYEA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001