Benhabib, Berna (CPSO#: 94247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Turkish

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
640 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 3S1
Phone: (519) 641-3627
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berna Benhabib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Benhabib ( CPSO# 94247 )

Business Address:
640 Hyde Park Road
Suite 4
London ON  N6H 3S1
Phone Number: (519) 641-3627

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNA BENHABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENHABIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2014