Bercier, Jean-Philippe (CPSO#: 93189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
361 Main St. East
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A8
Phone: (613) 632-0605
Fax: (613) 632-7073
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Philippe Bercier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bercier ( CPSO# 93189 )

Business Address:
570 Lacolle Way
Orleans ON  K4A 0N9
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
101 - 361 Main Street East
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A8
Phone Number: (613) 632-0605

Business Address:
1111 Rue Ghislain
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-PHILIPPE BERCIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERCIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012