Berger, Pamela Sumiko (CPSO#: 84237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-1919 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 722-5793
Fax: (613) 728-4480
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhagirath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bhagirath ( CPSO# 84238 )
Dr. P. Berger ( CPSO# 84237 )

Business Address:
Nation River Health Clinic
494 Fred Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-0915


Corporation Name: Pamela Berger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bhagirath ( CPSO# 84238 )
Dr. P. Berger ( CPSO# 84237 )

Business Address:
201-1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 722-5793

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA SUMIKO BERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012