Bergeron, Pierre (CPSO#: 68983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

501 Montreal road
Cornwall ON  K6H 1C1
Canada
Phone: (613) 933-8155
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Centre Ste Sante de l'Estrie
841 Sydney Street
Cornwall ON  K6H 3T7
Canada
Phone: (613) 937-2683
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Bergeron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bergeron ( CPSO# 68983 )

Business Address:
1 - 501 Montreal Road
Cornwall ON  K6H 1C1
Phone Number: (613) 933-8155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE BERGERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGERON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997