Berman, Hal David (CPSO#: 72373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Yiddish

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 13
4th Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 1537
Fax: (416) 586-4804
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hal Berman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Berman ( CPSO# 72373 )

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
4th Floor Box 13
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAL DAVID BERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002