Bertucci, Joseph (CPSO#: 95907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malton Medical Centre
Suite 201
6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone: (905) 677-4200
Fax: (905) 677-0541
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Bertucci Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bertucci ( CPSO# 95907 )

Business Address:
Malton Medical Centre
Suite 201
6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 677-4200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH BERTUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTUCCI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013