Beshay, Sanaa Seliman (CPSO#: 72973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
134 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1H9
Phone: (905) 268-0188
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: (705) 435-5142
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Oakville-Trafalgar Hospital
3001 hospital gate
oakville
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beshay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Beshay ( CPSO# 72973 )

Business Address:
SMD Medical Clinic
134 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1H9
Phone Number: (905) 268-0188

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalger Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4616

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANAA SELIMAN BESHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1998