Best, Adrienne Mary Catherine (CPSO#: 86753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave. East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gonsalves and Best Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Best ( CPSO# 86753 )
Dr. P. Gonsalves ( CPSO# 84732 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 362-8822

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
Suite 4A
345 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Phone Number: (416) 515-0590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE MARY CATHERINE BEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2010