Bhalla, Jaswinder (CPSO#: 94886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Oct 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Jiwaji University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Cedar Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1A9
Phone: 705 222 6287
Fax: 705 222 6288
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaswinder Bhalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bhalla ( CPSO# 94886 )

Business Address:
115 Cedar Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1A9
Phone Number: (705) 222-6286

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2005 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 26 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., October 26, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Jaswinder Bhalla:

            (i)   Dr. Bhalla shall practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                  acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor").

            (ii)  Dr. Bhalla shall engage a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                  at her own expense who shall: 

                  i.    Every month, select and review twenty (20) patient charts for
                        patients who have had a patient encounter with Dr. Bhalla in the
                        preceding month;
                  ii.   Meet with Dr. Bhalla at least once every month to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor's review of the patient charts and to discuss
                        any concerns arising from the chart reviews; 
                  iii.  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other materials or
                        conducting interviews with patients, staff or colleagues, that the
                        Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to the Clinical Supervision;
                        and
                  iv.   Submit written reports to the College at least once every month, or
                        immediately if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about Dr.
                        Bhalla's standard of practice or that Dr. Bhalla's patients may be
                        exposed to the risk of harm or injury.
                  
            (iii) Dr. Bhalla shall ensure that the undertaking of the Clinical Supervisor
                  is delivered to the College within fourteen (14) days of the date of this
                  Order.  If Dr. Bhalla has not delivered an undertaking signed by a
                  Clinical Supervisor to the College by this date, Dr. Bhalla shall cease
                  practising medicine until she delivers an undertaking signed by a
                  Clinical Supervisor to the College, and the fact of this restriction
                  shall be a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of
                  registration.

            (iv)  If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking is unable or
                  unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, Dr. Bhalla shall, within
                  fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                  undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is
                  acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                  within that time.

            (v)   If Dr. Bhalla is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the terms set
                  out in section (iv) above, Dr. Bhalla shall cease practising medicine
                  until she delivers an undertaking signed by a Clinical Supervisor to the
                  College, and the fact of this restriction shall be a term, condition or
                  limitation on her certificate of registration.

            (vi)  Dr. Bhalla shall consent to the disclosure by her Clinical Supervisor to
                  the College and by the College to the Clinical Supervisor of all
                  information the Clinical Supervisor and/or the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to fulfil the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and to
                  monitor Dr. Bhalla's compliance with this Order.


            (vii) Dr. Bhalla shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order,
                  provide the College with the addresses of all locations where she
                  practices, and, if she commences practice at a new location subsequently,
                  shall provide the College with its address within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location (her "Practice Location(s)").

            (viii)Dr. Bhalla shall cooperate with any inspection of her Practice
                  Location(s) by the College, which may be made without notice and which
                  may include but not be limited to reviews of patient charts and/or other
                  records and to interviews with patients or staff at any Practice
                  Location(s) in order to monitor her compliance with the Order. 

            (ix)  Dr. Bhalla shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order,
                  provide to the College her irrevocable consent for the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"), to
                  monitor her compliance with the terms of this Order.

            (x)   Dr. Bhalla shall be responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges,
                  and expenses arising from the implementation of this Order.