Bhandal, Harleen Gill (CPSO#: 92070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Govind Singh Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite Lower C
568 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W6
Phone: (519) 491-7775
Fax: (519) 344-2727
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harleen Bhandal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bhandal ( CPSO# 92070 )

Business Address:
Lower C - 568 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W6
Phone Number: (519) 491-7775

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Dec 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Harleen  Gill  Bhandal may practise medicine independently in paediatrics,
            only.