Bhanji, Tania (CPSO#: 101084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati, Urdu

Education:McGill University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Lambeth Medical Clinic
3090 Colonel Talbot Rd, Unit 2
London ON  N6P 0B3
Phone: 519-842-3994
Fax: 226-213-7004
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Skin Disorders Clinic
Box 160
36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Canada
Phone: 519-666-1610 Ext. 208
Fax: 519-913-2899
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tania Bhanji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bhanji ( CPSO# 101084)

Business Address:
London Lambeth Medical Clinic
2-3090 Colonel Talbot Road
London ON  N6P 0B3
Phone Number: (519) 842-3994

Business Address:
Skin Disorders Clinic
36 Heritage Drive
Box 160
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone Number: (519) 666-1610

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANIA BHANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2014 to 02 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016